Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 02/11/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 02/11/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 02/11/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 02/11/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 02/11/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 02/11/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/12/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 02/12/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/12/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/12/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/12/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/13/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/25/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/25/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/25/1997
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 02/25/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/25/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 02/25/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/25/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/25/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/05/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/05/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/05/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/11/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/11/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/19/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 03/19/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/08/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/08/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/14/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/14/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 04/14/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/16/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 04/16/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/16/1997