Committees: H.R.695 — 105th Congress (1997-1998)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/12/1997 Referred to
05/14/1997 Markup by
05/22/1997 Reported by H. Rept. 105-108,Part 1
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts and Intellectual Property03/05/1997 Referred to
03/20/1997 Hearings by
04/30/1997 Markup by
04/30/1997 Reported by
House International Relations02/12/1997 Referred to
07/22/1997 Markup by
07/25/1997 Reported by H. Rept. 105-108,Part 2
House International Relations Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade03/03/1997 Referred to
06/24/1997 Markup by
06/24/1997 Reported by
House Commerce06/26/1997 Referred to
09/24/1997 Markup by
09/29/1997 Reported by H. Rept. 105-108,Part 5
House Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection07/14/1997 Referred to
09/04/1997 Hearings by
House National Security06/26/1997 Referred to
07/30/1997 Hearings by
09/09/1997 Markup by
09/12/1997 Reported by H. Rept. 105-108,Part 3
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)06/26/1997 Referred to
09/09/1997 Hearings by
09/11/1997 Markup by
09/16/1997 Reported by H. Rept. 105-108,Part 4