Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/20/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/20/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/20/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/20/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/20/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/20/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/20/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/20/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/20/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/20/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/21/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/10/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/10/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 04/10/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/10/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 04/10/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/10/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 04/10/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/10/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/10/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 04/10/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/10/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/10/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/01/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/01/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/01/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/01/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/01/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/01/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/01/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/01/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/01/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 05/01/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/15/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 05/15/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/15/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/15/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/15/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/15/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/15/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/15/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/15/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/15/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/15/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/10/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 06/10/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/10/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/10/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/10/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/10/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/10/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 06/12/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/19/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/19/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/19/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/19/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/19/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/19/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/19/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/19/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/19/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/19/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/23/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/16/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/16/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 11/05/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 11/05/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 02/12/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/12/1998
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 03/26/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/26/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/25/1998
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/16/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/16/1998