Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 01/09/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/09/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 01/09/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/09/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/26/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/26/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/26/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/26/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 02/26/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/26/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/23/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/23/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/23/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/23/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 04/23/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/23/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/23/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/01/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/01/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/14/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/14/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/10/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/23/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/23/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/04/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/04/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 10/21/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/26/1998
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 02/26/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/26/1998
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 02/26/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/26/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/26/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/11/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/11/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 03/27/1998
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/27/1998
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/22/1998
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 04/22/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/22/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/19/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/05/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/17/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/17/1998