Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 02/12/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 02/26/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/26/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/26/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/26/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/26/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 02/26/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/11/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/11/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/11/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/11/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/18/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/18/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/18/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/10/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/10/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/16/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/16/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/01/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/06/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 05/06/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/03/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/03/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/20/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/09/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 07/11/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/17/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/17/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/17/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/17/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/17/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/24/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/24/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/28/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/28/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/31/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 08/01/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/16/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/16/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 09/25/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/30/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/08/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/28/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 10/28/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/07/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/07/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 01/28/1998
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/24/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/25/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/01/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/28/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 04/29/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/29/1998