Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/13/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/13/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/13/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/13/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/26/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 02/26/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/27/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 02/27/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/11/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/11/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/11/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/11/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/12/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/12/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/18/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/19/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/19/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 03/19/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 04/10/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/10/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/10/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/16/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/16/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 04/17/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 04/17/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/23/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/23/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/30/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/08/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 05/08/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/21/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/21/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/03/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/11/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/20/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/25/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/25/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/25/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 06/26/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/09/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/04/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/04/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/24/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 09/30/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 10/24/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 11/04/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 01/28/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/04/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/04/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/24/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/24/1998
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/18/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/18/1998
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/23/1998
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/23/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/15/1998
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 09/16/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew