Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/18/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/20/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/20/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/20/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/20/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/20/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/20/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/20/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/20/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 03/20/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/20/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/20/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 03/20/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/20/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 03/20/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/20/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 03/20/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/20/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/20/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/20/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/09/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/09/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/09/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 04/09/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/09/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/09/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 04/15/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/15/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/15/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/15/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 04/24/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/21/1997