Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/12/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/10/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/10/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/10/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/10/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 05/14/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/14/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 05/14/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 06/25/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/11/1997