Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/20/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 03/20/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/17/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/17/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/17/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/17/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/26/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/26/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/26/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/26/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/26/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/16/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/16/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/04/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/04/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/04/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/04/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/04/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 10/09/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/04/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/04/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/06/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 11/12/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/13/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/24/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/13/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/13/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 06/04/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/23/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/07/1998