There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Citizen's Fair Hearing Act of 1997

Short Titles as Introduced

Citizen's Fair Hearing Act of 1996

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Endangered Species Act of 1973 to ensure that persons that suffer or are threatened with injury resulting from a violation of the Act or a failure of the Secretary to act in accordance with the Act have standing to commence a civil suit on their own behalf.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
03/21/1997 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 105-42.
02/13/1997 Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
03/21/1997 Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 28.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/21/1997 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 105-42.
Action By: Committee on Resources
03/12/1997 Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Resources
03/12/1997 Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Resources
02/21/1997 Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
Action By: Committee on Resources
02/13/1997 Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/1997 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/13/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/13/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 02/13/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/26/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 03/11/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 03/12/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/17/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/20/1997

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources02/13/1997 Referred to
03/12/1997 Markup by
03/21/1997 Reported by H. Rept. 105-42

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.R.752.

Subjects (10)

  • Claims
  • Endangered species
  • Government liability
  • Parties to actions
  • Right of property

Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.752. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (03/21/1997)

Citizen's Fair Hearing Act of 1997 - Amends the Endangered Species Act of 1973 to provide that any person who satisfies the requirements of the Constitution and demonstrates having suffered or being threatened with economic or other injury resulting from a violation of such Act or a failure of the Secretary of Commerce to act in accordance with it shall be deemed to be within the zone of protected interests of such Act and shall have standing to commence a civil suit on his or her own behalf.