Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/13/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/13/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 02/13/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/26/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 03/11/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 03/12/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/17/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/20/1997