Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/13/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/27/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/27/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/27/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/27/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/27/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/27/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/27/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/27/1997
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 03/06/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/06/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/06/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/06/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/06/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/13/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/13/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/13/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 03/13/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/13/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/20/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/20/1997
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 03/20/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/21/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/21/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/08/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/08/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/08/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/08/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/08/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/17/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/17/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/17/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/17/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/17/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/24/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/24/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/24/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/24/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/24/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/24/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/24/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/24/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/24/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/06/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/06/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/06/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/06/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/06/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/08/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 05/08/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/08/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/22/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/22/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/08/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/08/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/08/1997