Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/19/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/19/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/19/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/19/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/19/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/19/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/19/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/19/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/17/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/17/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/06/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/06/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/06/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/06/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/06/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/06/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/06/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/06/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/07/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/13/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/15/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/15/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 05/21/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 05/21/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/04/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/10/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/10/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/17/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/18/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/18/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/08/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/08/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/16/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 07/22/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/22/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/04/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/09/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/11/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/17/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/18/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/18/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 09/23/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/23/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/25/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/29/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/30/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/07/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/23/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/23/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/23/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 11/04/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/26/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 02/26/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/25/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/30/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/30/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/13/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/13/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/19/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/19/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 07/15/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/30/1998