Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/13/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/26/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 02/26/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/27/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/27/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/27/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/05/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/05/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/05/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/11/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/11/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/11/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/12/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/18/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/18/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/10/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/10/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/10/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/10/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/10/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/10/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 04/10/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/10/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/16/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 04/23/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/30/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/30/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/30/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/08/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/08/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/08/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/08/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/26/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/26/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/09/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 07/09/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/16/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/16/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/17/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/22/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/22/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/24/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/24/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/24/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/31/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 07/31/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/31/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 09/04/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 09/05/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/05/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/24/1997