There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Truth in Employment Act of 1997

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Labor Relations Act to protect employer rights.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/13/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
02/05/1998Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations
10/09/1997Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations
03/03/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
02/13/1997Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/1997Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E252-253)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (122)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/25/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/25/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/25/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/25/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/25/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 02/25/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/25/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/25/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/25/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 02/25/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/25/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/15/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/15/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/15/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/15/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/15/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 04/15/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/15/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/15/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/15/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/15/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/15/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 04/15/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 04/15/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/15/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/15/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/13/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/13/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/13/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/13/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/13/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/13/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/13/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/10/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 06/25/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/25/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/25/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/25/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/26/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/26/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/26/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/26/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/26/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 06/26/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/10/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 07/10/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/10/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/16/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/16/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/25/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/25/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/25/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/25/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/03/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 09/03/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/03/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/25/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/25/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 10/01/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 10/23/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/30/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 10/30/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/30/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 11/07/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 11/07/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 11/13/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 01/27/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/28/1998
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/12/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 02/12/1998
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 02/12/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/24/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/03/1998
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/05/1998
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/17/1998
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/19/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and the Workforce02/13/1997 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations03/03/1997 Referred to
02/05/1998 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.758.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.758. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/13/1997)

Truth in Employment Act of 1997 - Amends the National Labor Relations Act to provide that nothing in specified prohibitions against unfair labor practices shall be construed as requiring an employer to employ any person who seeks or has sought employment with the employer in furtherance of other employment or agency status.