Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/26/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/26/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/26/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/04/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 03/04/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/04/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/12/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/12/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/12/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/12/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/08/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/08/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/20/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 01/27/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/27/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/11/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/09/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/16/1998