Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/04/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/06/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/11/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/10/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 04/16/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/08/1997