Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/08/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/08/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/08/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/08/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/08/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/08/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/08/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/08/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/08/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/08/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/08/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/08/1997
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/08/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/08/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/08/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/08/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/08/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/08/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/08/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/08/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/08/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/08/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/08/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/08/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/29/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/29/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/29/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/29/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 04/29/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/29/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/29/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/29/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/29/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/29/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/08/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/08/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/08/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/08/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/08/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 05/08/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/08/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/08/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/12/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/12/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/12/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/12/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/12/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/12/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/25/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/25/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/25/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/25/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 06/25/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/25/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/25/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/25/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/25/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/25/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/09/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/09/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/09/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/09/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/09/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/15/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/15/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 07/15/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/15/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/15/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/15/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 07/15/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/15/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/15/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/15/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/15/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/23/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/23/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/23/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/23/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 07/29/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/29/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/03/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/03/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/03/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 09/03/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/03/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/03/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/04/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 09/04/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/10/1997
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 09/10/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/26/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/26/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 10/01/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 10/08/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/08/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/21/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/22/1997
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/28/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 11/05/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 11/05/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 02/11/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 02/11/1998
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/12/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/24/1998