Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/26/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/26/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/26/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/10/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/10/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/20/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/08/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/25/1997