There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Agricultural Adjustment Act to restore the effectiveness of certain provisions regulating Federal milk marketing orders.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/13/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/13/1997Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
02/25/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy and Poultry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/13/1997Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/25/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/25/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/25/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/25/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/25/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/25/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/25/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/27/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 02/27/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/27/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/27/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/27/1997
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/06/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/06/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/19/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/18/1997

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture02/13/1997 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy and Poultry02/25/1997 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.786. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/13/1997)

Extends the termination date (and restores lapsed authority) for milk marketing order seasonal base plans under the Agricultural Adjustment Act.