Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/25/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/25/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/25/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/25/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/25/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/25/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/25/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/27/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 02/27/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/27/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/27/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/27/1997
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/06/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/06/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/19/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/18/1997