Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/13/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 02/13/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/13/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/13/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 02/13/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/25/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 02/26/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/26/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 02/26/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/27/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/05/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/13/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/13/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/17/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/21/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/08/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/08/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/08/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/10/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 04/10/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/10/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 04/15/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/15/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/16/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 04/16/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/23/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/23/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/23/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/29/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/29/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/01/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/01/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/01/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/13/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 05/20/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/03/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/04/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/11/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/19/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/19/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/23/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 06/23/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/08/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 07/09/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/09/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/22/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 07/22/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/24/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/31/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/08/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/09/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/16/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 09/23/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/23/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 09/24/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/24/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/24/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/24/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/24/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/25/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/07/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 10/08/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 10/08/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/21/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 10/31/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/19/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew