Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/03/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 07/14/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/27/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 03/27/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/20/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/04/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/04/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/04/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 06/04/1998
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/05/1998
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/05/1998