Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 01/21/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 01/21/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 01/21/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 01/21/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 01/21/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/21/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 01/21/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 01/21/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 01/21/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/21/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 01/21/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 01/21/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/21/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 01/21/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/21/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 01/21/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 01/21/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 01/21/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 01/21/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 01/21/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/04/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/04/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 02/04/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/04/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/04/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/04/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/04/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/04/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/13/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/13/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/13/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/13/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/13/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/13/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 02/26/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/26/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/26/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/26/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/26/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/05/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/05/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/05/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/18/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/18/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/18/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/17/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/17/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 04/17/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/17/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/17/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 04/17/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/17/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 04/17/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/17/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/17/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/17/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/01/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 05/01/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/01/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/01/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 05/01/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/01/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/16/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/16/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 07/30/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/03/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/03/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/06/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/21/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 11/04/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/13/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 01/27/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 06/25/1998