Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/25/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/11/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 03/11/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/11/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/11/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/11/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/11/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/11/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/11/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/11/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/11/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/11/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/11/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/19/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/19/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/19/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/19/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/19/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/19/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 04/09/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/09/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 04/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/10/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/16/1997

Show cosponsors who withdrew