Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/12/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/17/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/17/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/17/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/17/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/18/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/18/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/18/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/21/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/21/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/08/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 04/08/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/10/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/15/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/16/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/16/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 04/30/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/05/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/07/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/13/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/13/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/13/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/15/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/22/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/04/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/08/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/28/1997