Committees: H.R.856 — 105th Congress (1997-1998)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources02/27/1997 Referred to
04/21/1997 Hearings by
05/21/1997 Markup by
06/12/1997 Reported by H. Rept. 105-131
House Rules02/27/1997 Referred to
07/11/1997 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/05/1998 Referred to
07/15/1998 Hearings by