Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/27/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/27/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/27/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/12/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/12/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/12/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/13/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/19/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/17/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 04/17/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/07/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 05/07/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/20/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/20/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/20/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/20/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/20/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/22/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/22/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/22/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 06/20/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/20/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/20/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 07/23/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/23/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/23/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 07/23/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/09/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/09/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 09/09/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 09/09/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/09/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/09/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/24/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/24/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/08/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/28/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 06/04/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/15/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/15/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 08/05/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/15/1998
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 09/25/1998
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/25/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/08/1998