Committees: H.R.858 — 105th Congress (1997-1998)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources02/27/1997 Referred to
05/21/1997 Markup by
06/18/1997 Reported by H. Rept. 105-136
House Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health03/04/1997 Referred to
03/05/1997 Hearings by
04/24/1997 Markup by
04/24/1997 Reported by
House Agriculture02/27/1997 Referred to
06/18/1997 Discharged from
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Forestry, Resource Conservation and Research03/04/1997 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/10/1997 Referred to
10/22/1997 Markup by
11/04/1997 Reported by S. Rept. 105-138
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Public Land Management07/11/1997 Referred to
07/24/1997 Hearings by