Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/14/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/14/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/14/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/15/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/15/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/04/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/08/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 07/10/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/23/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/24/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/24/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/24/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/24/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/28/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/29/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/29/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/31/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/31/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 09/03/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/03/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/03/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/03/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/08/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/08/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 09/09/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/11/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/17/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/25/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/08/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/09/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/21/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 11/12/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/27/1998
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/27/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/27/1998
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/03/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/03/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/03/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/05/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/05/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/05/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/05/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/11/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/11/1998
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/11/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/11/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 02/11/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/12/1998
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/12/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/12/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 02/12/1998
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 02/12/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 03/02/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/03/1998
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 03/11/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/16/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/18/1998
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/18/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/24/1998
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 04/21/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/21/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/06/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/12/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/12/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/22/1998
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/04/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/17/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/09/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/09/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew