Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/03/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/03/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/03/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 06/03/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/04/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/10/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/10/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/16/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/03/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/03/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/03/1997