Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/27/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 02/27/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/27/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/17/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/17/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 03/17/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 03/17/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/17/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/17/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/17/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/17/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 03/17/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/17/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/17/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/17/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/20/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/20/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/17/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 04/17/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/17/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 04/17/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/17/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/17/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/17/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/17/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 04/17/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/17/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/17/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/17/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/17/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/17/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/14/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/14/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/14/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/14/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 05/14/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/14/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 05/14/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 05/14/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 05/14/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/14/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/14/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/03/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/03/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/03/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 06/03/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/03/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/03/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/03/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/03/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/03/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/03/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/11/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/11/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/18/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/18/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/11/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/11/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/11/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/11/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/11/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/11/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 07/11/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/11/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/11/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 09/09/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/09/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/09/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/09/1997
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/09/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/02/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 10/02/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/02/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/02/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/02/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/02/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 10/02/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 10/24/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/24/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/24/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/24/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/24/1997
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 01/27/1998
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/24/1998
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/24/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 03/24/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/24/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 03/30/1998
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/28/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/28/1998
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/28/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/28/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/28/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/13/1998
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/13/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/13/1998
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/21/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/21/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/21/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/21/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/11/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 06/18/1998
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/23/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/23/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/14/1998
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/14/1998