Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/12/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/18/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 03/18/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/20/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/20/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 04/08/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/08/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/08/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/08/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 04/15/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/15/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/15/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/15/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/15/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/15/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/15/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/17/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/23/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/29/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/29/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 04/29/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/13/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/13/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/13/1997
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 05/13/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/13/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/13/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/13/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/13/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/13/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/13/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 05/15/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/15/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/15/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/15/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/22/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 05/22/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/22/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/22/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/03/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/03/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/03/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/03/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/03/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/11/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/11/1997
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/11/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/11/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/11/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/19/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/19/1997
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/19/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/19/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/19/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/26/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/26/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/26/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 07/08/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/08/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/09/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 07/15/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/15/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/17/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/17/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/23/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/23/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/23/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/23/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/30/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/03/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/03/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/04/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/05/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/09/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/16/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/17/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/17/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/30/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/30/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/29/1997