Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/27/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 02/27/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/27/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/13/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/13/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/13/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/13/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/13/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/13/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/13/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/13/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/13/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/13/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 03/13/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/13/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/13/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 03/13/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/13/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/13/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/10/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/10/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/10/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/10/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/10/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/10/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/10/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/06/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/06/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/06/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/06/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/06/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 05/08/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/08/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 05/08/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/08/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/08/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/08/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/08/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/08/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 05/15/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/15/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/15/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/15/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 05/15/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/09/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/09/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/05/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/05/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 09/05/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/05/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 09/05/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/05/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/05/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/05/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/05/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 10/21/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/21/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/21/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/21/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 10/21/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/21/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/21/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/21/1997