Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/27/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/27/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/27/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/27/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/27/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/27/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/27/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 03/12/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/12/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/12/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/12/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 03/12/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/12/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 03/12/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/12/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/16/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/16/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/16/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/16/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/16/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/16/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/16/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/16/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/16/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 04/16/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/16/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 04/16/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/16/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/16/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 04/16/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 04/16/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/16/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/16/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/16/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/16/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/16/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/16/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/01/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/01/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/01/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/21/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/21/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/21/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/21/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/21/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/24/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/10/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/25/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/31/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/04/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/04/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/10/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/26/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/26/1997
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 10/08/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 10/23/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 11/05/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 11/05/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 11/07/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 11/13/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/03/1998
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 02/03/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 02/12/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/24/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/04/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/04/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 03/12/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 03/25/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/25/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/25/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/01/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/01/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/22/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 05/21/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/17/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/23/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 08/03/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 10/07/1998
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/07/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/07/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/07/1998
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 10/09/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/09/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/09/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/09/1998
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/10/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/10/1998
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/10/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/10/1998
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/10/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew