Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 03/03/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 03/03/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/03/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/05/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 03/11/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 03/11/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/11/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/11/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/11/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/12/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/12/1997
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/12/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/12/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/13/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/13/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/13/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/08/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/24/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/08/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/08/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/20/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/23/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/25/1997