Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/04/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 03/04/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/04/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 03/04/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/04/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/04/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/06/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/06/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 03/06/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/06/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/06/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/20/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/20/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/20/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/20/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/20/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/20/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/09/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/09/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/09/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 04/09/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/09/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/09/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/15/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 04/15/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/15/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/15/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/15/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/17/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/17/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/23/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/23/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/23/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/23/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/23/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 04/23/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/23/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/24/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/24/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/24/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/24/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/01/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 05/01/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/01/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 05/01/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/01/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/01/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/01/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/01/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/08/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/08/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 05/08/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/08/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/13/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/16/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/16/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/20/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/20/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/20/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/20/1997