Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/15/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/15/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/15/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/15/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/15/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/15/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/15/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/24/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/24/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/24/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/13/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/13/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/13/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/13/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/13/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/13/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/13/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/13/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/13/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/13/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/13/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/13/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/13/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/13/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/13/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/13/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/13/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/13/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/13/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 06/04/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/04/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/04/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/04/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/04/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/04/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 06/04/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/04/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/04/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/04/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/04/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/04/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/04/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 06/04/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/04/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/08/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/08/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 07/08/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/08/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/08/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/08/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/08/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/04/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/04/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/04/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/04/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/04/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/04/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 09/04/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 09/04/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/04/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/04/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/04/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/30/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/30/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/30/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/30/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/30/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/30/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/30/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 09/30/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/30/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 09/30/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/30/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/30/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/30/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/30/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/30/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/30/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/30/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/30/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/30/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/30/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/30/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/30/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/08/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 10/08/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/08/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/08/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/08/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/06/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/06/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/06/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 11/06/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 11/06/1997
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 11/06/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 11/13/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/01/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/01/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 04/01/1998
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/01/1998
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 04/01/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/18/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/18/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/18/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/18/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/18/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/18/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/18/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/18/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 06/18/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/18/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/18/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/18/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/18/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/25/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 06/25/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/25/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 08/06/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 08/06/1998