There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Infrastructure Improvement Act of 1997

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Transportation to make grants to States for the construction and maintenance of highways, to direct the Federal Communications Commission to conduct spectrum auctions to provide funding for the grants, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/04/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
03/17/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Surface Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/14/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
03/04/1997Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
03/04/1997Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
Action By: House of Representatives
03/04/1997Referred to House Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
03/04/1997Referred to the Committee on Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/04/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/11/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/08/1997

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Commerce03/04/1997 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection03/14/1997 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/04/1997 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Surface Transportation03/17/1997 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/04/1997 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.918.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.918. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/04/1997)

Infrastructure Improvement Act of 1997 - Directs the Federal Communications Commission to conduct competitive bidding for licenses and permits for portions of the public electromagnetic spectrum allocated for commercial use that become available for licenses and construction during FY 1998 through 2002 and that result in specified proceeds.

Requires such proceeds to be deposited into the Infrastructure Improvement Trust Fund established by this Act. Makes such funds available to the Secretary of Transportation to be apportioned among the States during FY 1998 through 2002 based on the percentage of estimated tax payments attributable to highway users in a State paid into the Highway Trust Fund for the latest fiscal year. Permits such funds to be used only for the construction and maintenance of State highways. Allows a State to be eligible for such funds only if it submits annually to the Secretary a plan describing its use of such funds.

Requires a Federal share of 80 percent of the total cost of a project or activity conducted using funds apportioned under this Act.