Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/04/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/04/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/04/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/06/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/11/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/11/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/11/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/18/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/18/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/10/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/10/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/10/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/10/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/14/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/15/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 04/28/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/13/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/15/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/15/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/21/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/06/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/11/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/11/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/24/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/05/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/21/1998