Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/06/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/20/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/20/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/30/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/07/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/10/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/26/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 07/28/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 09/08/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/16/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 01/28/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 01/28/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 01/28/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 01/28/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 01/28/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 02/04/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/04/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 02/04/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 02/04/1998
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/04/1998
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/04/1998
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/04/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/04/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/04/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/04/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 02/04/1998
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 02/25/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/25/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/25/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/25/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 02/25/1998
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/25/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/25/1998
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/10/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/10/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/10/1998
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/24/1998
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 05/13/1998
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/18/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/21/1998
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/21/1998