Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/05/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/05/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/11/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 03/11/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/13/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/16/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/16/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/16/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/16/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/16/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/16/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/23/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/26/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/16/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/22/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/03/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/05/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/23/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/13/1997