Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/11/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/11/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/11/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/11/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/13/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/13/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/13/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/13/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/13/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/13/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/13/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/13/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/13/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/08/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/08/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/08/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 04/17/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/17/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/17/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/17/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/17/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/17/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/17/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 04/17/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 04/29/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/29/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 04/29/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 04/29/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/29/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/29/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/29/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/29/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 04/29/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/16/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/16/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/16/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/30/1997