Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/05/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/05/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 03/05/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/19/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/19/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/19/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/19/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/19/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/19/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/19/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/19/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/19/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/19/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/19/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/19/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/19/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/19/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/19/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/15/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/15/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 04/15/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/16/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/17/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/29/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/01/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/01/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/06/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/06/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/06/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 05/14/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/22/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 06/24/1997