Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/05/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 03/05/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 03/11/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/11/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/11/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/11/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/11/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/20/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/20/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/20/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/16/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/16/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/16/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/16/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/16/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/16/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/16/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/16/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/06/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/06/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/08/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/03/1997
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/19/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/19/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/24/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/25/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/30/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/05/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/05/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/27/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 01/27/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/06/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew