Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 02/10/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 02/12/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/12/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/25/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/25/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/04/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/04/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 03/04/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/04/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/05/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/05/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/06/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/11/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/11/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/13/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/13/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/13/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/13/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/13/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/18/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 03/18/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/18/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/18/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/18/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/20/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/21/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/08/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/08/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/08/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/08/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/08/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/08/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/08/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/08/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/09/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/09/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/09/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/09/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/09/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 04/10/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/10/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/15/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/15/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/15/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/15/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 04/15/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/15/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/17/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/17/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/17/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 04/17/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 04/29/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/29/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 04/29/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/01/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/01/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 05/01/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/01/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/06/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/06/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/07/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 05/07/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/08/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/08/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/13/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/13/1997
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 05/13/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/13/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/15/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/15/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/15/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/21/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/21/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/22/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 06/03/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 06/03/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/04/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/04/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/04/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/10/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/10/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 06/10/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/17/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 06/17/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/20/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 06/20/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/20/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/25/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/26/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 07/10/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/22/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/22/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/31/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/09/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/17/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 01/27/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/10/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/10/1998
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/10/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/12/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/12/1998
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/17/1998
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 03/24/1998
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/24/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/01/1998
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/21/1998
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/21/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/09/1998