Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/06/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/08/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 04/08/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/09/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/09/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/09/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 04/15/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/16/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/16/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 04/17/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/17/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/17/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 04/17/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/17/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/17/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/17/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 04/17/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/23/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/23/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/23/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/24/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/24/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/24/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/24/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/30/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/01/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/01/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/01/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/01/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/01/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/01/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/06/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 05/07/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/14/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/14/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/20/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/08/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/24/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/30/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/30/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 10/07/1997
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 10/08/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 10/08/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/08/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 10/09/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 10/09/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/06/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 11/06/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/23/1998
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 04/23/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/11/1998