Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/13/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 03/13/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 03/13/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/13/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/13/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/13/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/13/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/20/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/20/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/10/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/10/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/10/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/10/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/23/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/23/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/30/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/10/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/05/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/21/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/21/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/30/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 11/04/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/05/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/06/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/03/1998
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/11/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/21/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 04/21/1998