Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/06/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/18/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/09/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 04/10/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/10/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 04/29/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/15/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/22/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/04/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/23/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 09/30/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 10/21/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/25/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew