Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/13/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/20/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/20/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/20/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/08/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/08/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/08/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/10/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 04/10/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/10/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 04/16/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/16/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/30/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/16/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/05/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/05/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/05/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/05/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/05/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/19/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/19/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/19/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/19/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/26/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/09/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/09/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 07/17/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/17/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/25/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 08/01/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 08/01/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/04/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/04/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/10/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/10/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/10/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/10/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/16/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/16/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/09/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 10/28/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/28/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/28/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/28/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/28/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/30/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/30/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/06/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 01/28/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/28/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 01/28/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/11/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/11/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/11/1998
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/24/1998
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 03/03/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/03/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/03/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 03/03/1998
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/04/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/04/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/04/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/04/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/04/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/04/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/05/1998
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/05/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/05/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/10/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 03/10/1998
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/10/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/10/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/10/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/10/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/10/1998
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/10/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/10/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/10/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 03/10/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/11/1998
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/11/1998
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/11/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/11/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/11/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/11/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/11/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/12/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/12/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/12/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/12/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/12/1998
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/12/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/12/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/12/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/17/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/19/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/19/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/19/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/19/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/19/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/19/1998
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/19/1998
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 03/19/1998
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/19/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/19/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/24/1998
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 03/24/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/24/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 03/24/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/26/1998
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/26/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/30/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/30/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/30/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 03/30/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/01/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 05/07/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew